DiscoverOrg Data, LLC v. Aliro Group LLC

Plaintiff: DiscoverOrg Data, LLC
Defendant: Aliro Group LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv05928
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aliro Group LLC.(Bigby, Aaron)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Aliro Group LLC (Bigby, Aaron)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Aaron D Bigby on behalf of Defendant Aliro Group LLC. (Bigby, Aaron)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/31/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/7/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (MET)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Aliro Group LLC (MET)
November 15, 2018 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (MET)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DiscoverOrg Holdings, LLC for DiscoverOrg Data, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DiscoverOrg Data, LLC (Durrance, Nathaniel)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Aliro Group LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5542493) Attorney Nathaniel Eli Durrance added to party DiscoverOrg Data, LLC(pty:pla), filed by DiscoverOrg Data, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Durrance, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiscoverOrg Data, LLC v. Aliro Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DiscoverOrg Data, LLC
Represented By: Nathaniel Eli Durrance
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliro Group LLC
Represented By: Aaron D Bigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?