Perasso v. Washington Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Riky Perasso
Defendant: Officer Vincent Stroup, Washington Department of Corrections, Investigator Michael Gleason, Investigator Michael Wayman, Washington State Department of Corrections, Wayman, Mike Gleason and Strope
Case Number: 3:2018cv05934
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 4-5. (Parker, Darryl)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AMENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. The deadline for the parties' FRCP 26(f) conference is January 21, 2019. The initial disclosures deadline is now February 11, 2019. Counsel and any pro se parties are now directed to confer and provide the Court with a Discovery Plan by February 18, 2019. (SP)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION and (proposed) order to extend deadlines, filed by Plaintiff Riky Perasso. Noting Date 12/28/2018, (Parker, Darryl)
December 18, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Daniel J Judge for Defendants Gleason, Strope, Washington State Department of Corrections, Wayman. (Judge, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Earl M Sutherland on behalf of Defendants Gleason, Strope, Washington State Department of Corrections, Wayman. (Sutherland, Earl)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DISCOVERY DEADLINES ORDER by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel: The deadline for the parties' FRCP 26(f) conference is December 21, 2018; the initial disclosure deadline is January 11, 2019; and a Discovery Plan is due by January 18, 2019. (GMR)
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Gleason, Strope, Washington State Department of Corrections, Wayman.(Judge, Daniel)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Wayman mailed on 11/19/2018 (Parker, Darryl)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Strope mailed on 11/19/2018 (Parker, Darryl)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Gleason mailed on 11/19/2018 (Parker, Darryl)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Riky Perasso (Parker, Darryl)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (MET)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Thurston Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MET)
November 16, 2018 Judge Benjamin H. Settle and Judge David W. Christel added. (MET)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Daniel J. Judge re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Defendants Michael Gleason, Vincent Stroup, Washington Department of Corrections, Michael Wayman (Judge, Daniel)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Michael Gleason, Vincent Stroup, Washington Department of Corrections, Michael Wayman. (Judge, Daniel)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Michael Gleason, Vincent Stroup, Washington Department of Corrections, Michael Wayman (Judge, Daniel)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 18-2-05195-34; (Receipt # 0981-5545108), filed by Washington Department of Corrections, Michael Wayman, Vincent Stroup, Michael Gleason. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Judge, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perasso v. Washington Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Vincent Stroup
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Department of Corrections
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investigator Michael Gleason
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investigator Michael Wayman
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Represented By: Earl M Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayman
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Represented By: Earl M Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Gleason
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Represented By: Earl M Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strope
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Represented By: Earl M Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riky Perasso
Represented By: Darryl Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?