Marquette v. Boe et al
Plaintiff: Harold R Marquette
Defendant: Scott Russell and Jeri Boe
Case Number: 3:2018cv05976
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: David W Christel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, filed by Plaintiff Harold R Marquette. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Harold Marquette, Prisoner ID: 930890)(SP)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OR AMEND re #8 Complaint; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. Plaintiff is directed to Show Cause or Amend complaint on or before January 11, 2019. **12 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Harold Marquette, Prisoner ID: 930890)(SP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2018: #1 1983 Complaint form (blank), #2 Amended Defendant List (blank), #3 Pro se Instruction Sheet) (SP). Modified on 12/14/2018: docket entry to be regenerated (SP).
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Jeri Boe and Scott Russell, filed by Harold R Marquette. (IFP Granted) **6 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Harold Marquette, Prisoner ID: 930890)(SP)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Harold Marquette, Prisoner ID: 930890)(SP)
December 13, 2018 Response to Show Cause #9 Order due by 1/11/2019. **DO NOT PRINT**(Harold Marquette, Prisoner ID: 930890)(SP)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER from Harold R. Marquette Regarding Denial of Necessities by DOC, filed by Harold R Marquette. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Harold Marquette, Prisoner ID: 930890)(SP)
December 4, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE re #4 Proposed Document(s). The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Clallam Bay Corrections Center. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Harold Marquette, Prisoner ID: 930890)(SP)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 IFP deficiency corrected: prison trust account statement received re #1 Application. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Harold Marquette, Prisoner ID: 930890)(SP)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED Motion and Request re #2 Letter, filed by Plaintiff Harold R Marquette. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Harold Marquette, Prisoner ID: 930890)(SP)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 12/27/2018 to correct. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Harold Marquette, Prisoner ID: 930890)(MET)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harold R Marquette (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)**9 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Harold Marquette, Prisoner ID: 930890)(MET)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquette v. Boe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold R Marquette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeri Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?