Pederson v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Clinton D Pederson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv05988
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order 15 MINUTE ORDER striking (Dkt. #13 in 3:18-cv-05988-RJB) MOTION to Stay United States' Motion to Stay Answer and Joint Status Report filed by United States of America. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
January 11, 2019 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tricia S. Boerger on behalf of Defendant United States of America. (Boerger, Tricia)
January 10, 2019 13 MOTION to Stay United States' Motion to Stay Answer and Joint Status Report, filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/18/2019, (Boerger, Tricia)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES AND REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT. This case is consolidated with C18-5338RJB, McGill v U.S. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 28, 2018 11 OBJECTIONS to Joinder in Response to Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Clinton D Pederson (Cox, Adam)
December 21, 2018 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on The United States Attorney's Office Western District of Washington on 12/4/2018, filed by Plaintiff Clinton D Pederson. (Cox, Adam)
December 21, 2018 9 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Attorney General of The United States US Department of Justice on 12/4/2018, filed by Plaintiff Clinton D Pederson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Cox, Adam)
December 13, 2018 Response to OSC due by 12/28/2018. (JL)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: JOINDER OF RELATED CASES. Show Cause Response due by 12/28/2018. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 12, 2018 JSR due 3/4/2019. (JL)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan for all further proceedings as related to C18-5338RJB. Judge Ronald B. Leighton no longer assigned to case. Entered as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
December 10, 2018 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 3:18-cv-05338, by Plaintiff Clinton D Pederson. (Cox, Adam)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/4/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/25/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
December 3, 2018 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney's Office DC).(KB)
December 3, 2018 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (KB)
December 3, 2018 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (KB)
November 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5562474), filed by Clinton D Pederson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorneys Office Tacoma, #3 Summons US Attorneys Office DC)(Cox, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pederson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton D Pederson
Represented By: Adam C Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Tricia S. Boerger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?