Lawson v. Key

Petitioner: Geoffrey Robert Lawson, Sr
Respondent: James Key
Case Number: 3:2018cv05998
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST by Petitioner Geoffrey Robert Lawson, Sr to Correct the Record re Location of Incarceration re #13 Order Directing Service (Airway Heights Corrections Center is correct; Stafford Creek Corrections Center is incorrect). **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Geoffrey Lawson, Prisoner ID: 334928)(GMR)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Joseph Samson on behalf of Respondent James Key. **PRINT ALL**(Geoffrey Lawson, Prisoner ID: 334928)(Samson, John)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, 2254 PETITION by email upon the Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Washington; signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. ( #9 Petition and this Order emailed 12/13/2018) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Geoffrey Lawson, Prisoner ID: 334928)(SP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2018: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet) (SP).
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER from Clerk to pro se petitioner re receipt of transfer case from the Eastern District of Washington and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Geoffrey Lawson, Prisoner ID: 334928)(SP)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 Case transferred in from the Eastern District of Washington, Case Number 2:18-cv-00289. Documents 1-10 received electronically.
November 29, 2018 Judge Ronald B. Leighton and Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke added. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Geoffrey Lawson, Prisoner ID: 334928)(SP)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Geoffrey Lawson, Prisoner ID: ) [Transferred from waed on 12/4/2018.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $0, Receipt #IFP) Filed by Geoffrey Robert Lawson, Sr.(LR, Case Administrator) **72 PAGES, PRINT NEF ONLY**(Geoffrey Lawson, Prisoner ID: ) [Transferred from waed on 12/4/2018.]
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DENYING PENDING MOTION. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (LR, Case Administrator) **3 PAGES, PRINT ALL** (Geoffrey Lawson, Prisoner ID: ) [Transferred from waed on 12/4/2018.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION OF GEOFFREY R. LAWSON IN SUPPORT OF #6 MOTION REQUESTING ACCESS TO MANDATORY SAVINGS ACCOUNT TO PAY THE $5.00 HABEAS FILING FEE filed by Geoffrey Robert Lawson, Sr. (SK, Case Administrator) **15 PAGES, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Geoffrey Lawson, Prisoner ID: ) Modified on 11/28/2018 - Document contains financial information. Document not available to public (SK, Case Administrator). [Transferred from waed on 12/4/2018.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 PETITIONER'S MOTION REQUESTING AN ORDER ALLOWING PETITIONER ACCESS TO HIS PRISON MANDATORY SAVINGS ACCOUNT TO PAY THE $5.00 HABEAS FILING FEE by Geoffrey Robert Lawson, Sr. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2018 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (SK, Case Administrator) **5 PAGES, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Geoffrey Lawson, Prisoner ID: ) [Transferred from waed on 12/4/2018.]
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH FILING FEE REQUIREMENTS ( Petitioner must either pay the full filing fee or comply with the in forma pauperis statute. ) Case Management Deadline set for 11/26/2018. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Geoffrey Lawson, Prisoner ID: ) [Transferred from waed on 12/4/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 IFP page two) (VR, Courtroom Deputy) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Geoffrey Lawson, Prisoner ID: ) [Transferred from waed on 12/4/2018.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 ***Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by:Geoffrey Robert Lawson, Sr (VR, Courtroom Deputy) **2 PAGE(S), DO NOT PRINT** (Geoffrey Lawson, Prisoner ID: ) [Transferred from waed on 12/4/2018.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Filed by Geoffrey Robert Lawson, Sr.(VR, Courtroom Deputy) **72 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Geoffrey Lawson, Prisoner ID: ) [Transferred from waed on 12/4/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Geoffrey Robert Lawson, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Key
Represented By: John Joseph Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?