State of Washington v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: State of Washington
Defendant: United States of America, John Does, 1-5 and John Does
Case Number: 3:2018cv06000
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay deadlines. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, William M. McCool. (KEB)
January 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #4 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KEB)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay United States' Motion to Stay Responsive Pleading and Initial Scheduling Deadlines, filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/18/2019, (Boerger, Tricia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tricia S. Boerger on behalf of Defendant United States of America. (Boerger, Tricia)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff State of Washington (Huot, Matthew)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Matthew D. Huot on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Huot, Matthew)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
December 10, 2018 Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 3/11/2019. (KEB)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 3/11/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/25/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/4/2019, by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
December 10, 2018 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #4 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KEB)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 2/11/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (KB)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States of America. (KB)
December 10, 2018 Judge David W. Christel added. (KB)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5571332) Attorney Yasmine L Tarhouni added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Tarhouni, Yasmine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Yasmine L Tarhouni
Represented By: Matthew D. Huot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Tricia S. Boerger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?