Randal v. XPO Logistics Inc et al

Plaintiff: Allison N. Randal and Allison N Randal
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1-5, Ray A. Naegeli, Tillamook County Creamery Association, Michael D. Michelena, John Doe 1-5, XPO Logistics, Inc, XPO Logistics Inc, J Doe Corporations and/or Entities, Ray A Naegeli, J Doe and Michael D Michelena
Case Number: 3:2018cv06002
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Michael D. Michelena on 12/23/2018, filed by Plaintiff Allison N Randal. (Ham, Young-Ji)
January 22, 2019 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Ray A. Naegeli on 12/26/2018, filed by Plaintiff Allison N Randal. (Ham, Young-Ji)
January 22, 2019 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Tillamook County Creamery on 12/26/2018, filed by Plaintiff Allison N Randal. (Ham, Young-Ji)
January 16, 2019 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Damages by Ray A Naegeli, Tillamook County Creamery Association.(Butler, Shawn)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 4/10/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/27/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/3/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
January 8, 2019 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shawn Q Butler on behalf of Defendants Ray A Naegeli, Tillamook County Creamery Association. (Butler, Shawn)
December 31, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas James Collins on behalf of Defendant Michael D Michelena. (Collins, Thomas)
December 18, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas James Collins on behalf of Defendant XPO Logistics Inc. (Collins, Thomas)
December 17, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jenna M Labourr on behalf of Plaintiff Allison N Randal. (Labourr, Jenna)
December 17, 2018 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on XPO Logistics, Inc. on 12/13/2018, filed by Plaintiff Allison N Randal. (Ham, Young-Ji)
December 12, 2018 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Allison N Randal. (Ham, Young-Ji)
December 10, 2018 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Michael D Michelena, Ray A Naegeli, Tillamook County Creamery Association, XPO Logistics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Michael D Michelena, #2 Summons Tillamook County Creamery Association, #3 Summons Ray A Naegeli)(KB)
December 10, 2018 6 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (KB)
December 10, 2018 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (KB)
December 7, 2018 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Ray A. Naegeli by Plaintiff Allison N. Randal (Ham, Young-Ji)
December 7, 2018 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Tillamook County Creamery Association by Plaintiff Allison N. Randal (Ham, Young-Ji)
December 7, 2018 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Michael D. Michelena by Plaintiff Allison N. Randal (Ham, Young-Ji)
December 7, 2018 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS XPO Logistics, Inc. by Plaintiff Allison N. Randal (Ham, Young-Ji)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Allison N. Randal against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5572518) Attorney Young-Ji Ham added to party Allison N. Randal(pty:pla), filed by Allison N. Randal.(Ham, Young-Ji)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randal v. XPO Logistics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray A. Naegeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tillamook County Creamery Association
Represented By: Shawn Q Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Michelena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics Inc
Represented By: Thomas James Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Doe Corporations and/or Entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray A Naegeli
Represented By: Shawn Q Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Michelena
Represented By: Thomas James Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison N. Randal
Represented By: Young-Ji Ham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison N Randal
Represented By: Young-Ji Ham
Represented By: Jenna M Labourr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?