Columbia State Bank et al v. Arslangiray

Appellant: Wells Fargo Bank NA, Columbia State Bank, Banner Bank NA and First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company
Interested Party: Bankruptcy Appeals (TAC), Plan Administrator and United States Trustee
Appellee: Ismail Arslangiray
Case Number: 3:2018cv06041
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Joint MOTION to Stay Appeal Pending Consummation of Settlement and Other Relief, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Stay Appeal Pending Consummation of Settlement and Other Relief, filed by Appellee Ismail Arslangiray, Appellants Banner Bank NA, Columbia State Bank, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA, Interested Party Plan Administrator. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion) Noting Date 1/23/2019, (Donahue, Terrence)
January 10, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Appellants must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/17/2019. (MET)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Record Status Request Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal (MET)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER re Filing of Bankruptcy Appeal (MET)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS - USBC No 11-42290-MJH; BK Internal Appeal No: 18-T009. (Bankruptcy Appeals (Tac/SLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia State Bank et al v. Arslangiray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Thomas Scott Linde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Columbia State Bank
Represented By: Alexander Sether Kleinberg
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Banner Bank NA
Represented By: Elizabeth H Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company
Represented By: Alexander Sether Kleinberg
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Appeals (TAC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Plan Administrator
Represented By: Mark D Waldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Trustee
Represented By: Sarah Rose Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ismail Arslangiray
Represented By: Daniel J. Bugbee
Represented By: Brett Lorin Wittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?