Crossfit Inc v. Binder et al

Plaintiff: Crossfit Inc. and Crossfit Inc
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Craig Binder
Case Number: 3:2018cv06046
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 4/2/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/26/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Crossfit Inc (Kim, Sally)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Crossfit Inc (Kim, Sally)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (KB)
December 27, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff Crossfit Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/3/2019. (KB)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of a Trademark action. Report emailed to the US Patent Office. (KB)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Craig Binder. (KB)
December 27, 2018 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (KB)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement and False Designation of Origin against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5593159) Attorney Sally Kim added to party Crossfit Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Crossfit Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Kim, Sally) Modified on 12/27/2018 to eliminate jury demand language (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crossfit Inc v. Binder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crossfit Inc.
Represented By: Sally Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crossfit Inc
Represented By: Sally Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?