Williams v. Sinclair et al
Plaintiff: James Anthony Williams
Defendant: Tim Thrasher, Stephen Sinclair, Bruce C Gage and Karie Rainer
Case Number: 3:2019cv05045
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Check status of service waivers per #7 Order Directing Service, due by 4/15/2019. **DO NOT PRINT** (James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600) (ERA)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Bruce C Gage, Karie Rainer, Stephen Sinclair, and Tim Thrasher, filed by James Anthony Williams. (IFP Granted) **192 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600) (ERA)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600) (ERA)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by E-Mail to the named defendants (4); signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke on (Complaint #6 , this Order and notice of lawsuit and waiver of service emailed 3/8/2019). (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Instruction Sheet)**6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600) (ERA)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Prison Trust Account Statement filed by James Williams. **3 PAGE(S) RECEIVED VIA USPS, PRINT NEF ONLY**(James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600)(GMR)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE re #4 Prison Trust Account Statement. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Washington State Penitentiary. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600)(GMR)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order IFP deficiency corrected upon filing of #4 Prison Trust Account Statement. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600)(GMR)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 2/15/2019 to correct. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600) (ERA) Modified on 1/16/2019 (EA). Modified on 1/17/2019 to add page count and print instructions only - NEF to be regenerated for noticing purposes (GMR).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff James Anthony Williams.(Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint) **195 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (James Williams, Prisoner ID: 740600) (ERA) Modified on 3/7/2019, converted to motion, IFP deficiency corrected (ERA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Sinclair et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Thrasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce C Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karie Rainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Anthony Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?