Young v. United States of America

Petitioner: James R Young
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv05077
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR ORDER RE WAIVER OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE, granting #8 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to petitioner at Coleman FL address. (JL)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON EMERGENCY MOTION TO EXTEND RESPONSE DATE, granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. 2255 motion renoted to 5/10/19. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to petitioner at Coleman FL address . Modified on 3/11/2019 (JL).
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Order re Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege, filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/15/2019, (Miyake, Bruce)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE/Letter, by Petitioner James R Young, to #5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time and Request for Extension to File Reply Brief. (GMR)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON EMERGENCY MOTION TO EXTEND RESPONSE DATE, renoting #5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Government's Reponse Date to 3/8/2019. Due date for the government's response to the petition should be reset for 3/11/19. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to petitioner at Coleman FL address . Modified on 3/4/2019 (JL).
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Government's Reponse Date, filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/1/2019, (Miyake, Bruce)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Petitioner James R Young. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(GMR)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER Setting briefing schedule re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by James R Young. Government's Responsive Brief due by 3/1/2019, Reply Brief due by 3/15/2019. The Court will determine whether oral argument is necessary based on the briefs filed. s/Tyler Campbell, at the direction of Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy to Petitioner at Coleman address. (TC)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Petitioner re case number and Judge assignment. (GMR)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by James R Young. Related to criminal cases: 3:14-cr-05242-RJB-1; 3:14-cr-05548-RJB-2. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 envelope)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Bruce F. Miyake
Represented By: Ye-Ting Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James R Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?