Hernandez Sanchez v. United States of America

Petitioner: Rodrigo Hernandez Sanchez
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv05105
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of United States of America against Rodrigo Hernandez Sanchez. Paper copy sent to petitioner. (TC)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255, denying Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Dkt. #1 ) (also posted in CR17-5384RJB). Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to petitioner at FDC SeaTac. (JL)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs , filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/15/2019, (Penalver, Andre)
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE, by Respondent United States of America, to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (Attachments: #1 Transcript, Motion to Suppress, #2 Transcript, Motion to Withdraw Guilty Plea)(Penalver, Andre)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER Setting briefing schedule re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Rodrigo Hernandez Sanchez. Government's Responsive Brief due by 3/15/2019, Reply Brief due by 3/29/2019. The Court will determine whether oral argument is necessary based on the briefs filed. s/Tyler Campbell, at the direction of Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy to Petitioner at FDC-SeaTac. (TC)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (ERA)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255), filed by Rodrigo Hernandez Sanchez. Related to criminal case: 3:17-cr-05384-RJB. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Envelope) (ERA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez Sanchez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rodrigo Hernandez Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: David Reese Jennings
Represented By: Andre M. Penalver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?