Lewis v. Ferguson et al

Plaintiff: Justin Edward Lewis
Defendant: Samuel Carson, John Sackman, Craig Ferguson, Sascha Siebertz, Justin Nohrenberg, Samuel G Carson, Sascha A Siebertz and John A Sackman
Case Number: 3:2019cv05108
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Susan L Rogers on behalf of Defendants Samuel G Carson, Craig Ferguson, Justin Nohrenberg, John A Sackman, Sascha A Siebertz. (Rogers, Susan)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendants Samuel G Carson, Craig Ferguson, Justin Nohrenberg, John A Sackman, and Sascha A Siebertz, signed by attorney John C Purves, mailed on 3/7/2019. (ERA)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO UPDATE ADDRESS signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. Notice of change of address due by 5/17/2019. (ERA - cc: Plaintiff)
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel John C Purves for Defendants Samuel G Carson, Craig Ferguson, Justin Nohrenberg, John A Sackman, Sascha A Siebertz from 3/29/19 to 4/5/19; 9/3/19 to 9/6/19 and 9/13/2019. (Purves, John)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John C Purves on behalf of Defendants Samuel G Carson, Craig Ferguson, Justin Nohrenberg, John A Sackman, Sascha A Siebertz. (Purves, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant John A Sackman, signed by John A Sackman, mailed on 3/7/2019. (SP)
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Sascha A Siebertz, signed by Sascha A Siebertz, mailed on 3/7/2019. (SP)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Justin Nohrenberg, signed by Justin Nohrenberg, mailed on 3/7/2019. (ERA)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 Mail addressed to Justin Edward Lewis returned as "Return to Sender - Not in Jail" re #4 Order on IFP and Payments re In Custody Prisoners. (SP)
March 7, 2019 Check status of service waivers re #6 Order Directing Service, due by 4/13/2019. (ERA)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by 1st Class Mail to the named defendants (5) with a courtesy copy to the Kitsap County Prosecutor, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (Complaint #5 , this order, and the notice of lawsuit/request for waiver and waiver of service mailed on 3/7/2019). (ERA - cc: plaintiff w/ Pro Se Instruction Sheet)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Samuel G Carson, Craig Ferguson, Justin Nohrenberg, John A Sackman, Sascha A Siebertz, filed by Justin Edward Lewis. (IFP granted) (ERA)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance, Kitsap Jail Inmate Account Manager) (ERA)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (ERA)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Justin Edward Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Envelope) (ERA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Ferguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Ferguson
Represented By: John C Purves
Represented By: Susan L Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sascha Siebertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Nohrenberg
Represented By: John C Purves
Represented By: Susan L Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel G Carson
Represented By: John C Purves
Represented By: Susan L Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sascha A Siebertz
Represented By: John C Purves
Represented By: Susan L Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A Sackman
Represented By: John C Purves
Represented By: Susan L Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Edward Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?