Koenen v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Keith Koenen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv05110
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint Attorney General, Office of General Counsel and US Attorney's Office by Plaintiff Keith Koenen on 3/29/2019 (Halpern, Elie)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Keith Koenen for Service of Summons and Complaint (Halpern, Elie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (PM)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Keith Koenen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PM)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (PM)
February 13, 2019 REFERRING #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to: Judge Brian A Tsuchida. (ERA)
February 13, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (ERA)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Keith Koenen. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Halpern, Elie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koenen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Koenen
Represented By: Elie Halpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?