IBEW Pacific Coast Pension Fund v. Puglia Marine LLC et al

Plaintiff: IBEW Pacific Coast Pension Fund
Defendant: Neil Turney, Bari Marine Holdings, LLC, Puglia Marine, LLC, 1410 Thorne Road, LLC, Puglia Engineering of California, Inc., Puglia Marine LLC, Neil M Turney, 1410 Thorne Road LLC, Puglia Engineering of California Inc and Bari Marine Holdings
Case Number: 3:2019cv05129
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by 1410 Thorne Road LLC, Bari Marine Holdings, Puglia Engineering of California Inc, Puglia Marine LLC, Neil M Turney.(Birmingham, Richard)
March 28, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION re #8 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action; and MOTION to stay proceedings pending decision in arbitration. The defendants' notice is construed as a motion, and accordingly, is noted for consideration on 3/29/2019. (ERA)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY by Defendants 1410 Thorne Road LLC, Bari Marine Holdings, Puglia Engineering of California Inc, Puglia Marine LLC, Neil M Turney to #13 Response to #8 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action; and MOTION to stay proceedings pending decision in arbitration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hawkins, Christine) Modified on 3/28/2019 to add document relationship/link to underlying motion (ERA).
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Plaintiff IBEW Pacific Coast Pension Fund re #8 Notice of Pendency of Other Action, filed by Defendants (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David L. Sieck in support of Plaintiff's Response)(Sieck, David)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/28/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/4/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case is related to CV18-5809RBL and is therefore reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings. Judge Benjamin H. Settle no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Cc to RBL. (MGC)
March 11, 2019 Attorney Richard J. Birmingham for 1410 Thorne Road LLC,Richard J. Birmingham for Bari Marine Holdings,Richard J. Birmingham for Puglia Engineering of California Inc,Richard J. Birmingham for Puglia Marine LLC,Richard J. Birmingham for Neil M Turney added; per #6 Notice of Appearance. (ELS)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Plaintiff IBEW Pacific Coast Pension Fund to Defendants' Notice of Related Case (Ewers, Jane)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action; and MOTION to stay proceedings pending decision in arbitration in United States District Court Western District of Washington at Tacoma, case number in other court 18-05809 ; filed by Defendants 1410 Thorne Road LLC, Bari Marine Holdings, Puglia Engineering of California Inc, Puglia Marine LLC, Neil M Turney. (Hawkins, Christine) Modified on 3/28/2019, converted to motion at direction of chambers (ERA).
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 18-05809, by Defendants 1410 Thorne Road LLC, Bari Marine Holdings, Puglia Engineering of California Inc, Puglia Marine LLC, Neil M Turney. (Hawkins, Christine)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christine Hawkins on behalf of Defendants 1410 Thorne Road LLC, Bari Marine Holdings, Puglia Engineering of California Inc, Puglia Marine LLC, Neil M Turney. (Hawkins, Christine)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant All Defendants (Sieck, David)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by IBEW Pacific Coast Pension Fund (Sieck, David)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David L Sieck on behalf of Plaintiff IBEW Pacific Coast Pension Fund. (Sieck, David)
February 21, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, IBEW Pacific Coast Pension Fund must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/28/2019. (GMR)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendants 1410 Thorne Road LLC, Bari Marine Holdings, Puglia Engineering of California Inc, Puglia Marine LLC (main document), Neil M Turney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(GMR)
February 21, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5654684), filed by IBEW Pacific Coast Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Ewers, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IBEW Pacific Coast Pension Fund v. Puglia Marine LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Turney
Represented By: Richard J. Birmingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bari Marine Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Richard J. Birmingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puglia Marine, LLC
Represented By: Richard J. Birmingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1410 Thorne Road, LLC
Represented By: Richard J. Birmingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puglia Engineering of California, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Birmingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puglia Marine LLC
Represented By: Richard J. Birmingham
Represented By: Christine Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil M Turney
Represented By: Richard J. Birmingham
Represented By: Christine Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1410 Thorne Road LLC
Represented By: Richard J. Birmingham
Represented By: Christine Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puglia Engineering of California Inc
Represented By: Richard J. Birmingham
Represented By: Christine Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bari Marine Holdings
Represented By: Richard J. Birmingham
Represented By: Christine Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Pacific Coast Pension Fund
Represented By: Jane Ewers
Represented By: David L Sieck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?