Contreras v. United States of America

Petitioner: Jesus Rios Contreras
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv05136
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit A by Respondent United States of America re #5 MOTION to Seal Exhibit to #4 Response to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), #4 Response to 2255 Motion, (Lee, Seungjae)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Exhibit to #4 Response to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/3/2019, (Lee, Seungjae)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE, by Respondent United States of America, to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255),. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I)(Lee, Seungjae)
February 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer/Responsive Brief due by 4/12/2019, Reply Brief due by 5/10/2019. Matter noted for 5/17/19. (DK)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER Requiring Answer and Setting Briefing Schedule re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). Entered as authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (Copy mailed to Petitioner @ McCrae CI address.) (DK)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (ERA)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255), filed by Jesus Rios Contreras. Related to criminal case: 3:17-cr-05515-RBL-1 3:19-cv-05136-RBL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ERA) Modified on 2/22/2019 to correct related case number only (ERA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesus Rios Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Donald M Reno, Jr
Represented By: Seungjae Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?