Rocha v. Fred Meyer Stores Inc

Plaintiff: Bonnie S Rocha
Defendant: Fred Meyer Stores Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv05148
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Philip B Grennan for Defendant Fred Meyer Stores Inc from 4/22/19-4/26/19 and 5/2/19-5/3/19. (Grennan, Philip)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 6/24/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/10/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/17/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Ninamaria K Fuller on behalf of Plaintiff Bonnie S Rocha. (Fuller, Ninamaria)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to case. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William M. McCool. (TW)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Fred Meyer Stores Inc (Grennan, Philip)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Fred Meyer Stores Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fred Meyer Stores Inc (Grennan, Philip)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE to attach document (Verification corrected signature page) re #2 Verification of State Court Records by Defendant Fred Meyer Stores Inc (Attachments: #1 Verification signature page)(Grennan, Philip)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 PRAECIPE to attach document (corrected signature page) re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Fred Meyer Stores Inc (Attachments: #1 Notice signature page)(Grennan, Philip)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 3/8/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
February 27, 2019 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #2 Verification of State Court Records, #1 Notice of Removal were improperly signed by Philip Grennan. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature pages using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SP)
February 27, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Fred Meyer Stores, Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/6/2019. (SP)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP)
February 27, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (SP)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal (Declaration of Louiza Dudin) by Defendant Fred Meyer Stores, Inc. (Grennan, Philip)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 18-2-06346-34; (Receipt # 0981-5665577), filed by Fred Meyer Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Grennan, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocha v. Fred Meyer Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie S Rocha
Represented By: Ninamaria K Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Meyer Stores Inc
Represented By: Philip B Grennan
Represented By: Louiza M Dudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?