Cox et al v. Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Eric Mapes, Jessica Laing, T.J. Johnson, John Regan, Grace Cox, Ron Lavigne, Rob Richards, Erin Genia, Harry Levine, Jayne Rossman, Joellen Reineck Wilhelm, Jackie Krzyzek, Rochelle Gause, Julia Sokoloff and TJ Johnson
Defendant: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv05385
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Jayne Rossman filed by Plaintiff Grace Cox re #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Davis, Charles)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Harry Levine filed by Plaintiff Grace Cox re #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Davis, Charles)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff Grace Cox. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/26/2019, (Davis, Charles)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Allied World Specialty Insurance Company (DK)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Charles K. Davis filed by Plaintiff Grace Cox re #8 MOTION for Default (Davis, Charles)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default , filed by Plaintiff Grace Cox. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/12/2019, (Davis, Charles)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Allied World Specialty Insurance Company on 5/14/2019, filed by Plaintiff Grace Cox. (Davis, Charles)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 REDACTION to #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Grace Cox (Davis, Charles)
May 9, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint: The Application for Management Liability Insurance for Not for Profit Organizations contains personal identifiers (Employer Identification Number) that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event "Redacted Document" located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (KB)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/24/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/31/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Grace Cox via Insurance Commissioner (Davis, Charles)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. (ERA)
May 8, 2019 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (ERA)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 SEALED DOCUMENT COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Harry Levine, Eric Mapes, Joellen Reineck Wilhelm, Erin Genia, Ron Lavigne, Grace Cox, Rochelle Gause, Rob Richards, Julia Sokoloff, Jayne Rossman, T.J. Johnson, Jackie Krzyzek, Jessica Laing, and John Regan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Davis, Charles) (Fee paid-receipt #0981-5757403) Modified on 5/9/2019 - Document contains personal identifiers. Document sealed pursuant to Local Rule LCR 5.2. A redacted document will be filed by Counsel (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox et al v. Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Mapes
Represented By: Grace H Kimm
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Laing
Represented By: Grace H Kimm
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.J. Johnson
Represented By: Grace H Kimm
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Regan
Represented By: Grace H Kimm
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Cox
Represented By: Grace H Kimm
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Lavigne
Represented By: Grace H Kimm
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Richards
Represented By: Grace H Kimm
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Genia
Represented By: Grace H Kimm
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Levine
Represented By: Grace H Kimm
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayne Rossman
Represented By: Grace H Kimm
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joellen Reineck Wilhelm
Represented By: Grace H Kimm
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Krzyzek
Represented By: Grace H Kimm
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Gause
Represented By: Grace H Kimm
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Sokoloff
Represented By: Grace H Kimm
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TJ Johnson
Represented By: Grace H Kimm
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?