Citizens Insurance Company of America v. Fraley et al

Plaintiff: Citizens Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Burt Fraley, BFD Development, LLC and Kathy Fraley
Case Number: 3:2019cv05401
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Notice of Initial Assignment (Dkt. #11 ) case remains assigned to Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida. (AE)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING EXTENTION OF TIME TO ANSWER by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Defendants shall file their answer to Plaintiff's complaint by 9/11/2019.(AE)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST by Defendants BFD Development, LLC, Burt Fraley for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pirnke, Christopher)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before Magistrate Judge Tsuchida if this form is not returned 6/13/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AE)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Kathy Fraley on 5/29/2019, filed by Plaintiff Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Sekits, Matthew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Magnus Rune Andersson on behalf of Defendant BFD Development, LLC. (Andersson, Magnus)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephanie L Bloomfield on behalf of Defendant Kathy Fraley. (Bloomfield, Stephanie)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark Leen on behalf of Defendant Burt Fraley. (Leen, Mark)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Burt Fraley on 5/23/2019, filed by Plaintiff Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Sekits, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on BFD Development, LLC on 5/23/2019, filed by Plaintiff Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Sekits, Matthew)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Burt Fraley and Kathy Fraley. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SP)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Burt Fraley, Kathy Fraley and BFD Development, LLC. (SP)
May 13, 2019 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (SP)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Citizens Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Sekits, Matthew)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against defendant(s) BFD Development, LLC, Burt Fraley, Kathy Fraley with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5762732), filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Sekits, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens Insurance Company of America v. Fraley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Michael K McCormack
Represented By: Matthew J Sekits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burt Fraley
Represented By: Mark Leen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFD Development, LLC
Represented By: Magnus Rune Andersson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Fraley
Represented By: Stephanie L Bloomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?