Nay et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Price, Tim W. Nay and Tim Nay
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, BNSF Railway Company and National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Case Number: 3:2019cv05425
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Other Affiliate Burlington Northern Santa Fe LLC for BNSF Railway Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by BNSF Railway Company (Babb, Warren)
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Babb, Warren)
July 2, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by BNSF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Babb, Warren)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on National Railroad Passenger Corporation on 5/28/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Tim Nay, Gregory Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified mail receipt)(D'Amore, Thomas)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/10/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/24/2019. (TF)
June 11, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool; Case reassigned to District Judge Benjamin H. Settle and referred to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (TF)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on BNSF Railway Company on 5/30/2019, filed by Plaintiff Tim Nay. (D'Amore, Thomas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 6/14/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
June 7, 2019 Attorney Andrew Gordon Yates,Warren E. Babb, Jr,Katie Bass for BNSF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corporation added; per #16 Notice of Appearance. (PS)
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tim D. Wackerbarth on behalf of Defendants BNSF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (KMP)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Josh Sanders for Tim Nay and Gregory Price, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) Modified on 5/21/2019 for additional link to 2nd application (CDA).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mark Parrish for Plaintiffs Tim Nay and Gregory Price, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) Modified on 5/21/2019 for additional link to 2nd Application (CDA).
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mark Parrish FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Plaintiff Gregory Price (Oetken, Randy) Modified on 5/21/2019 - DUPLICATE, see Docket #5 . (KMP) (Main Document 12 replaced on 5/21/2019 corrected PHV application signed by local counsel Randy Oetken and correct document title) (CDA).
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Josh Sanders FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Gregory Price (Oetken, Randy) Modified on 5/21/2019 - DUPLICATE, see Docket #6 . (KMP) (Main Document 11 replaced on 5/21/2019 - corrected PHV application signed by local counsel Randy Oetken and to correct document title) (CDA).
May 21, 2019 Attorney Thomas D-Amore and Randy Oetken both maintain an office at 1220 Main Street, STE 400, Vancouver, WA 98660. (DS)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION Mark Parrish by Plaintiff Gregory Price (Oetken, Randy) Modified on 5/21/2019 - Stricken, filed in error. (KMP)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION Josh Sanders by Plaintiff Gregory Price (Oetken, Randy) Modified on 5/21/2019 - Stricken, filed in error. (KMP)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #7 Summons Issued. (Service of corrected image is attached). (SP)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) BNSF Railway Company and National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SP) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/17/2019) (SP).
May 17, 2019 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (SP)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Josh Sanders FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Tim W. Nay, Gregory Price (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5770383 (D'Amore, Thomas)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mark Parrish FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Tim W. Nay, Gregory Price (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5770358 (D'Amore, Thomas)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Daniel Gonzalez filed by Plaintiffs Tim W. Nay, Gregory Price re #2 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem (D'Amore, Thomas)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Gregory Price filed by Plaintiffs Tim W. Nay, Gregory Price re #2 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem (D'Amore, Thomas)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem, filed by Plaintiffs Tim W. Nay, Gregory Price. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/16/2019, (D'Amore, Thomas)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5770267) Attorney Thomas D'Amore added to party Tim W. Nay(pty:pla), filed by Tim W. Nay, Gregory Price. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons BNSF Railway Company, #3 Summons National Railroad Passenger Corporation)(D'Amore, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nay et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Price
Represented By: Randy Oetken
Represented By: Mark Parrish
Represented By: Josh Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim W. Nay
Represented By: Thomas D'Amore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Nay
Represented By: Thomas D'Amore
Represented By: Mark Parrish
Represented By: Josh Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?