Jackson et al v. US Bankruptcy Court Clerk for the City of Tacoma et al
Plaintiff: Kyntrel Jackson, Blake Suess, Bert Holmes, Sinister Daevayasnaham God, Daniel J Simms, John Alexander Fecteau and Daniel Jerimiah Simms
Defendant: S Lohneis, Stone, US Bankruptcy Court Clerk for the City of Tacoma, Yvette Stubbs, Timothy Thrasher, Ian Erickson, Stephen Sinclair and Jeri Boe
Case Number: 3:2019cv05475
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Kyntrel Jackson to #17 Report and Recommendations. Noted by clerk for 7/26/2019. **20 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Daniel Simms, Prisoner ID: 795743; Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427; Bert Holmes, Prisoner ID: 377250; John Fecteau, Prisoner ID: 381343) (ERA)
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. Noted for: 7/12/2019. **9 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Daniel Simms, Prisoner ID: 795743; Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427; Bert Holmes, Prisoner ID: 377250; John Fecteau, Prisoner ID: 381343)(GMR)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSMITTAL OF Updated Docket Sheet in Response to Request Contained in #15 Notice of Change of Address filed by Kyntrel Jackson. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949)(GMR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address to WCC, filed by Plaintiff Kyntrel Jackson only. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Daniel Simms, Prisoner ID: 795743; Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427; Bert Holmes, Prisoner ID: 377250; John Fecteau, Prisoner ID: 381343)(GMR)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 Mail addressed to Kyntrel Jackson returned as Undeliverable re #13 Notice of Change of Address. Per staff at CBCC-Clallam, inmate Jackson was transferred to WCC-Shelton on 6/13/19. Updated docket, regenerated notice for #13. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Daniel Simms, Prisoner ID: 795743; Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427; Bert Holmes, Prisoner ID: 377250; John Fecteau, Prisoner ID: 381343)(PS)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address from CBCC to AHCC on June 12th (with approximately 1 week at WCC) filed by Plaintiff John Alexander Fecteau. (Address updated to AHCC)**3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Daniel Simms, Prisoner ID: 795743; Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427; Bert Holmes, Prisoner ID: 377250; John Fecteau, Prisoner ID: 381343)(GMR)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED Exhibits to Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Blake Suess. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Daniel Simms, Prisoner ID: 795743; Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427; Bert Holmes, Prisoner ID: 377250; John Fecteau, Prisoner ID: 381343) (ERA)
June 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Blake Suess.**5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Daniel Simms, Prisoner ID: 795743; Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427; Bert Holmes, Prisoner ID: 377250; John Fecteau, Prisoner ID: 381343) (ERA)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (John Fecteau, Prisoner ID: 381343) (ERA)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Daniel Simms, Prisoner ID: 795743) (ERA)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949) (ERA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $400.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status. Filer has until 7/1/2019 to correct. (Attachments: #1 Blank IFP Form) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Bert Holmes, Prisoner ID: 377250) (ERA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $400.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status. Filer has until 7/1/2019 to correct. (Attachments: #1 Blank IFP Form) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427) (ERA)
May 29, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: Your document "First Set of Interrogatories" will not be filed in this case. Per LCR 5 (d), discovery documents are not to be filed in your court case. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Daniel Simms, Prisoner ID: 795743; Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427; Bert Holmes, Prisoner ID: 377250; John Fecteau, Prisoner ID: 381343) (ERA)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by John Alexander Fecteau. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Daniel Simms, Prisoner ID: 795743; Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427; Bert Holmes, Prisoner ID: 377250; John Fecteau, Prisoner ID: 381343) (ERA)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Daniel J Simms. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Daniel Simms, Prisoner ID: 795743; Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427; Bert Holmes, Prisoner ID: 377250; John Fecteau, Prisoner ID: 381343) (ERA)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Kyntrel Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Proposed Motion for Appointment of Counsel(UNSIGNED)) **51 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Kyntrel Jackson, Prisoner ID: 355949; Daniel Simms, Prisoner ID: 795743; Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427; Bert Holmes, Prisoner ID: 377250; John Fecteau, Prisoner ID: 381343) (ERA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. US Bankruptcy Court Clerk for the City of Tacoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyntrel Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Suess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bert Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sinister Daevayasnaham God
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Alexander Fecteau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jerimiah Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Lohneis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bankruptcy Court Clerk for the City of Tacoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvette Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Thrasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeri Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?