Wood v. Jinniu Investment LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Wood
Defendant: Jinniu Investment LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv05489
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Robert Wood (Terasaki, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Jinniu Investment LLC (Li, Yuhong)
June 21, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Jinniu Investment LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/28/2019. (GMR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Yuhong Li on behalf of Defendant Jinniu Investment LLC. (Li, Yuhong)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/3/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/20/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/27/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Jinniu Investment LLC. (GMR)
June 4, 2019 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5790800), filed by Robert Wood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Jinniu Summons)(Terasaki, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Jinniu Investment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wood
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Michael M Terasaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jinniu Investment LLC
Represented By: Yuhong Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?