DiscoverOrg Data LLC v. NexInfo Solutions Inc
Plaintiff: DiscoverOrg Data LLC
Defendant: NexInfo Solutions, Inc. and NexInfo Solutions Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv05507
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Defendant, filed by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/18/2019, (Durrance, Nathaniel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on NEXINFO SOLUTIONS, INC. c/o ARUN CAVALE, REGISTERED AGENT on 6/22/2019, filed by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg Data LLC. (Durrance, Nathaniel)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #4 Report Regarding Patent & Trademark. (Service of corrected image is attached). (SP)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (SP) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/6/2019) (SP). Modified on 6/6/2019 (SP).
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant NexInfo Solutions Inc. (SP)
June 6, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (SP)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DiscoverOrg Holdings, LLC for DiscoverOrg Data LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DiscoverOrg Data LLC (Durrance, Nathaniel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) NexInfo Solutions, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5795934) Attorney Nathaniel Eli Durrance added to party DiscoverOrg Data LLC(pty:pla), filed by DiscoverOrg Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Durrance, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiscoverOrg Data LLC v. NexInfo Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NexInfo Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NexInfo Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DiscoverOrg Data LLC
Represented By: Nathaniel Eli Durrance
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?