Odom et al v. BP Products North America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Michael J Odom, Agnes Marie Odom and Michael Odom
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, John Doe 1-50, Shell Oil Company, Valero Energy Company, Jane Doe 1-50, BP Products North America, Inc., US Oil & Refining Co., US Oil & Refining Co and BP Products North America Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv05520
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend Complaint Re: #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Agnes Marie Odom, Michael Odom. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/16/2019, (Yackulic, Corrie) Modified on 8/5/2019 - added document link (KAM).
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (Levin, Jason)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND Attorney Jason Levin added to party ExxonMobil Oil Corporation(pty:dft) by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation.(Levin, Jason)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kent Michael Fandel on behalf of Defendant BP Products North America Inc. (Fandel, Kent)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Shell Oil Company on 6/24/2019 (Yackulic, Corrie)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant BP Products North America Inc on 6/18/2019 (Yackulic, Corrie)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Valero Energy Company on 6/21/2019 (Yackulic, Corrie)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant ExxonMobil Oil Corporation on 6/13/2019 (Yackulic, Corrie)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant US Oil & Refining Co on 6/17/2019 (Yackulic, Corrie)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) BP Products North America Inc, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Shell Oil Company, US Oil & Refining Co and Valero Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(SP)
June 11, 2019 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SP)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christopher W Dysart for Agnes Marie Odom and Michael Odom, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher W. Dysart FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Agnes Marie Odom, Michael J Odom (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5799774 (Yackulic, Corrie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) BP Products North America, Inc., Jane Doe 1-50, John Doe 1-50, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Shell Oil Company, US Oil & Refining Co., Valero Energy Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5799756) Attorney Corrie Johnson Yackulic added to party Agnes Marie Odom(pty:pla), Attorney Corrie Johnson Yackulic added to party Michael J Odom(pty:pla), filed by Agnes Marie Odom, Michael J Odom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Yackulic, Corrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odom et al v. BP Products North America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: Jason Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Energy Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Oil & Refining Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Oil & Refining Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America Inc
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Odom
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes Marie Odom
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Represented By: Christopher W Dysart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Odom
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Represented By: Christopher W Dysart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?