Emmons v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Gary Emmons
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv05534
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 10/16/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/2/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/9/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Yates, Andrew)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Wackerbarth, Tim)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings as it related to similar cases before the him. Judge Ronald B. Leighton no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (GMR)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA)
June 12, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:19-cv-00909 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number and Judge. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 3:19-cv-005534 RBL. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (CDA)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Wackerbarth, Tim)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Andrew G. Yates re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wackerbarth, Tim)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 19-2-08008-1; (Receipt # 0981-5803104), filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint)(Wackerbarth, Tim) Modified on 6/12/2019 to correctly name Exh A (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emmons v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Emmons
Represented By: Barry Jacob Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?