Snedden v. Boe et al
Plaintiff: Steven J Snedden
Defendant: Corrections Officer G-303, McKenney, Clallam Bay Corrections Center and Jeri Boe
Case Number: 3:2019cv05539
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE, by Defendants Jeri Boe, Clallam Bay Corrections Center, Corrections Officer G-303, McKenney, to #14 MOTION to Amend #4 Complaint,,, #16 MOTION to Admit Amended Affidavit, #15 MOTION to Compel, #17 MOTION for Discovery. **PRINT ALL**(Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)(Dittman, John)
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Subpoena, filed by Plaintiff Steven J Snedden. Noted by clerk for 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Subpoena) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328) (ERA)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Admit Amended Affidavit, filed by Plaintiff Steven J Snedden. Noted by clerk for 8/2/2019. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328) (ERA)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED MOTION to Compel Discovery, filed by Plaintiff Steven J Snedden. Noted by clerk for 8/2/2019. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328) (ERA)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend #4 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Steven J Snedden. Noted by clerk for 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint) **8 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328) (ERA)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Clallam Bay Corrections Center mailed on 6/18/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)(Dittman, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant McKenney mailed on 6/18/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)(Dittman, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Corrections Officer G-303 mailed on 6/18/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)(Dittman, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jeri Boe mailed on 6/18/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)(Dittman, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Coulter Dittman on behalf of Defendants Jeri Boe, Clallam Bay Corrections Center, Corrections Officer G-303, McKenney. **PRINT ALL**(Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)(Dittman, John)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED Amended Compaint, filed by Plaintiff Steven J Snedden. **10 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328) (ERA)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Submit Affidavit, filed by Plaintiff Steven J Snedden. Noted for 7/12/2019. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328) (ERA)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Discovery, filed by Plaintiff Steven J Snedden. Noted for 7/19/2019. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328) (ERA)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Judge Theresa L Fricke via E-mail upon the following: Jeri Boe, Lt McKenney, Corrections Officer G-303 and Clallam Bay Corrections Center with a courtesy copy to the Attorney General of the State of Washington. ( #4 Complaint, this Order and the notice of lawsuit/request for waiver and waiver of service emailed 6/18/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)(GMR)
June 17, 2019 Check status of service waivers 7/25/2019. **DO NOT PRINT**(Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)(GMR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Jeri Boe, Clallam Bay Corrections Center, Corrections Officer G-303 and McKenney with JURY DEMAND, filed by Steven J Snedden. (IFP Granted) **8 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)(SP)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS; signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)(SP)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Plaintiff re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)(GMR)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Steven J Snedden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint) 12 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)(GMR) Modified on 6/13/2019 to add print instructions- NEF regenerated (GMR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snedden v. Boe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer G-303
Represented By: John Coulter Dittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKenney
Represented By: John Coulter Dittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clallam Bay Corrections Center
Represented By: John Coulter Dittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeri Boe
Represented By: John Coulter Dittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J Snedden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?