DiscoverOrg Data LLC v. Feathercap Inc
Plaintiff: DiscoverOrg Data LLC
Defendant: Feathercap, Inc. and Feathercap Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv05632
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (GMR)
August 12, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (GMR)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg Data LLC (Durrance, Nathaniel)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 10/28/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/15/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on FEATHERCAP, INC. c/o HARVARD BUSINESS SERVICES, INC., REGISTERED AGENT on 7/22/2019, filed by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg Data LLC. (Durrance, Nathaniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (KB)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Feathercap Inc. (KB)
July 15, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (KB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DiscoverOrg Holdings LLC for DiscoverOrg Data LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DiscoverOrg Data LLC (Durrance, Nathaniel)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Feathercap, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5840630) Attorney Nathaniel Eli Durrance added to party DiscoverOrg Data LLC(pty:pla), filed by DiscoverOrg Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Durrance, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiscoverOrg Data LLC v. Feathercap Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feathercap, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feathercap Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DiscoverOrg Data LLC
Represented By: Nathaniel Eli Durrance
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?