Kaur v. Pompeo et al
Plaintiff: Gurpreet Kaur
Defendant: Edgard D Kagan and Michael Richard Pompeo
Case Number: 3:2019cv05638
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 JSR due 10/15/2019. (JL)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/30/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/7/2019, Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2019. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Michael Richard Pompeo and Edgard D Kagan (SNP) Modified on 7/15/2019 to add additional defendant (KB).
July 12, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:19-cv-01075 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number and Judge. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 3:19-cv-05638-RJB. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (SNP)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint in Nature of Mandamus; Declarotary Statement/Judgment Action against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5840310) Attorney Bart Klein added to party Edgard D. Kagan(pty:dft), filed by Edgard D. Kagan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Klein, Bart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaur v. Pompeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgard D Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Richard Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurpreet Kaur
Represented By: Bart Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?