Romagosa v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Fleur Romagosa
Defendant: Unum Group and Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv05649
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Denial of Disability and Life Insurance Waiver of Premium Benefits by Unum Group, Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Huber, Charles)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline: Defendants Answers due by 9/10/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendants Unum Group, Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/19/2019, (Huber, Charles)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Per Jansen on behalf of Defendants Unum Group, Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Jansen, Per)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group for Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Unum Group, Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Huber, Charles)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Charles C Huber on behalf of Defendants Unum Group, Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Huber, Charles)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 10/28/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/15/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Unum Group, Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Summons Unum Life Insurance Company of America)(KB)
July 18, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (KB)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Denial of Disability and Life Insurance Waiver of Premium Benefits against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5848419), filed by Fleur Romagosa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Engle, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romagosa v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Charles C Huber
Represented By: Per Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Charles C Huber
Represented By: Per Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fleur Romagosa
Represented By: Aaron Isak Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?