Suess v. US Bankruptcy Court Clerk for the City of Tacoma et al
Plaintiff: Blake Suess
Defendant: Stephen Sinclair, Stone, US Bankruptcy Court Clerk for the City of Tacoma, S Lohneis, Yvette Stubbs, Timothy Thrasher, Ian Erickson and Jeri Boe
Case Number: 3:2019cv05716
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Response to #4 Order to File Amended Complaint due on or before 10/11/2019. (Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427)(SP)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. The Court hereby orders that if plaintiff wishes to proceed with this matter, he must file the amended proposed complaint required by the District Court's Order (see Dkt. #1 ) on or before October 11, 2019. The Clerk shall update the docket to reflect the new deadline for plaintiff's amended proposed complaint. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427)(SP)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER sent to Plaintiff re case number, judge assignment and deficiency: -per the Court's 7/31/2019 Order: Plaintiff Simms and Mr. Suess and Mr. Fecteau shall each file new proposed complaints in support of their individual in forma pauperis applications, under the new cause numbers assigned to them, within 30 days of the date of this Order. Each proposed complaint must include only claims, arguments, and defendants specific to each individual in that action. -Please find enclosed the correct Complaint form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 8/30/2019 to correct. (Attachments: #1 Complaint form) **11 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427)(GMR)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (originally filed in 3:19-cv-05475, docket #11), by Plaintiff Blake Suess. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427)(GMR)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER by Judge Ronald B. Leighton, from original, related case 3:19-cv-05475 RBL-JRC, directing the Clerk to open a new case for each of the 4 other plaintiffs and within each new case do the following: docket the corresponding plaintiff's Application to Proceed IFP from the original case; and assign them to District Judge Leighton and refer them to Magistrate Judge Creatura. Plaintiff Suess shall file a new proposed complaint in support of his in forma pauperis application, under this new cause number, within 30 days of the date of this Order. Each proposed complaint must include only claims, arguments, and defendants specific to each individual in that action. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Blake Suess, Prisoner ID: 318427)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suess v. US Bankruptcy Court Clerk for the City of Tacoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Suess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bankruptcy Court Clerk for the City of Tacoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Lohneis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvette Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Thrasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeri Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?