Nikonov et al v. Ritz et al
Plaintiff: Kuzbass Logistics, Inc., Andrey Nikonov, Vera Nikonov, Kuzbass Logistics Inc and Vera Nikonova
Defendant: Independent Dispatch, Inc., Richard R Ritz and Independent Dispatch Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv05741
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Independent Dispatch, Inc. on 8/14/2019, filed by Plaintiff Andrey Nikonov. (Beaty, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Independent Dispatch Inc, Richard R Ritz (Vandor, Brendan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint; Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages Based On Negligence with JURY DEMAND by Independent Dispatch Inc, Richard R Ritz.(Vandor, Brendan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Kuzbass Logistics Inc (Beaty, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/30/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/6/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Kuzbass Logistics Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/22/2019. (SP)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 8/20/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Cowlitz County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP)
August 13, 2019 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SP)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Michael G Beaty. Filed by Plaintiffs Kuzbass Logistics, Inc., Andrey Nikonov, Vera Nikonov. (Beaty, Michael) Changed Firm Name on 8/13/2019 (DS).
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Independent Dispatch, Inc. (Vandor, Brendan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Brendan Vandor In Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Independent Dispatch, Inc., Richard R Ritz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket & Attachments A-F)(Vandor, Brendan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cowlitz County Superior Court, case number 19-2-00743-08; (Receipt # 0981-5879300), filed by Richard R Ritz, Independent Dispatch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vandor, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nikonov et al v. Ritz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kuzbass Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G Beaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrey Nikonov
Represented By: Michael G Beaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Nikonov
Represented By: Michael G Beaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kuzbass Logistics Inc
Represented By: Michael G Beaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Nikonova
Represented By: Michael G Beaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Dispatch, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Vandor
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard R Ritz
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Vandor
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Dispatch Inc
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Vandor
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?