Wise v. WinCo Holdings Inc
Plaintiff: Tracy Wise
Defendant: WinCo Holdings, Inc. and WinCo Holdings Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv05744
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant WinCo Holdings Inc (Lentini, Richard)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 11/12/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/28/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/4/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from Kitsap County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (KB)
August 13, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (KB)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by WinCo Holdings, Inc. (Lentini, Richard)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kitsap County Superior Court, case number 19-2-02122-18; (Receipt # 0981-5879441) Attorney Richard P. Lentini added to party WinCo Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), filed by WinCo Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Lentini, Richard) Modified on 8/13/2019 (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wise v. WinCo Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WinCo Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Richard P. Lentini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WinCo Holdings Inc
Represented By: Richard P. Lentini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Wise
Represented By: Chalmers C Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?