Shrofe v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kenneth Shrofe
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv05749
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Net Worth and Payment of EAJA Fees by Plaintiff Kenneth Shrofe (Halpern, Elie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint Attorney General, Office of General Counsel and US Attorney's Office by Plaintiff Kenneth Shrofe on 10/04/2019 (Halpern, Elie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Kenneth Shrofe for Service of Summons and Complaint (Halpern, Elie)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (AE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (AE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP GRANTED), filed by Kenneth Shrofe.(AE)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING #1 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson.(AE)
August 13, 2019 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (KB)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Kenneth Shrofe. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Halpern, Elie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shrofe v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Shrofe
Represented By: Elie Halpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?