Hartford v. Grays Harbor County Officials et al
Plaintiff: Ira: Hartford and Ira Ray Dean Hartford, IV
Defendant: Grays Harbor County Officials, Katherine Soldova and David Edwards
Case Number: 3:2019cv05757
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Ira Ray Dean Hartford, IV. (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account Statement) (ERA)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 Prison Trust Account Statement, filed by Plaintiff Ira Ray Dean Hartford, IV. (ERA)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED Compulsory Counter Claim, filed by Plaintiff Ira Ray Dean Hartford, IV. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope) (ERA)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency: - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 9/16/2019 to correct. (SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford v. Grays Harbor County Officials et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grays Harbor County Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Soldova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira: Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Ray Dean Hartford, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?