Harttlet v. Haynes
Petitioner: Larell Lee Harttlet
Respondent: Ron Haynes
Case Number: 3:2019cv05780
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Habeas #5 Petition ripe for consideration on 11/1/2019. **DO NOT PRINT**(Larell Harttlet, Prisoner ID: 339098)(SP)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD filed by Respondent Ron Haynes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-27, pp. 1-360)**PRINT NEF ONLY: Documents will be served in paper form.**(Larell Harttlet, Prisoner ID: 339098)(Rose, Mandy)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Memorandum of Authorities by Ron Haynes. Noting Date 11/1/2019, **PRINT ALL**(Larell Harttlet, Prisoner ID: 339098)(Rose, Mandy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mandy Lynn Rose on behalf of Respondent Ron Haynes. **PRINT ALL**(Larell Harttlet, Prisoner ID: 339098)(Rose, Mandy)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, 2254 PETITION by E-Mail upon the Respondent and upon the Attorney General of the State of Washington; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. ( #5 Petition and this Order emailed 8/26/2019) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Larell Harttlet, Prisoner ID: 339098)(SP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Larell Lee Harttlet. (IFP Granted) **28 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Larell Harttlet, Prisoner ID: 339098)(SP)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Larell Harttlet, Prisoner ID: 339098)(SP)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Larell Harttlet, Prisoner ID: 339098)(GMR)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Larell Lee Harttlet. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus)**31 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Larell Harttlet, Prisoner ID: 339098)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harttlet v. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larell Lee Harttlet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Haynes
Represented By: Mandy Lynn Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?