Longshore v. Mason County et al
Plaintiff: Charles S Longshore
Defendant: Albert Hernandez, Mason County Sheriffs Office, John Doe, Casey Salisbury, Shelton Police Department, Randy Newell, Kevin Hanson, John and Jane Does 1-10 and Mason County
Case Number: 3:2019cv05844
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: David W Christel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss is granted, Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied as moot, and the Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Charles Longshore, Prisoner ID: 332121)(GMR)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel re #6 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal filed by Charles S Longshore. Noting Date: 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Charles Longshore, Prisoner ID: 332121)(GMR)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff Charles S Longshore. Noted by clerk for: 10/4/2019. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Charles Longshore, Prisoner ID: 332121)(GMR)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED Motion to Appoint Counsel Pursuant to 23(G)(3) filed by Plaintiff Charles S Longshore. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Charles Longshore, Prisoner ID: 332121)(GMR)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED Motion for Order Streamlining E-Filings filed by Plaintiff Charles S Longshore. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Charles Longshore, Prisoner ID: 332121)(GMR)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to plaintiff re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Charles Longshore, Prisoner ID: 332121)(GMR)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Charles S Longshore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Class Action Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Transmittal Letter)**40 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Charles Longshore, Prisoner ID: 332121)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longshore v. Mason County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason County Sheriffs Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Salisbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelton Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles S Longshore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?