Kertchen v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Plaintiff: Vitaliy Kertchen
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Case Number: 3:2019cv05871
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Lambert, Michelle)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Lambert, Michelle)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/8/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/26/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SP)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE: Plaintiff Vitaliy Kertchen has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation, filed by Vitaliy Kertchen. (Summons(es) to be issued) (Receipt # TAC015873) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Transmittal Email)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kertchen v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vitaliy Kertchen
Represented By: Vitaliy Kertchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?