Busey v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Plaintiff: James Busey
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 3:2019cv05880
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint; by Wells Fargo Bank NA.(Roundtree, Al)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Al Roundtree filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA re #11 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Roundtree, Al)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Roundtree, Al)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Stuart Charles Morgan for Plaintiff James Busey from 10/18-20/19, 11/8/19, 11/15-17/19, 12/21/19-1/5/20. (Morgan, Stuart)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Stuart C. Morgan filed by Plaintiff James Busey re #11 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Morgan, Stuart)
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff James Busey, to #11 MOTION to Dismiss . (Morgan, Stuart)
September 27, 2019 REFERRING #11 MOTION to Dismiss to: Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Al Roundtree filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA re #11 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Roundtree, Al)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/18/2019, (Roundtree, Al)
September 26, 2019 REFERRING JSR due 12/26/19 (motion calendar tracking event) to: Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
September 26, 2019 JSR due 12/26/2019. (JL)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/11/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/18/2019, Joint Status Report due by 12/26/2019. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan Case and referred to Hon. Brian A Tsuchida pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (TF)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Bryan J. Case and Wendy E Lyon for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Case, Bryan)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Seth B Burack for Wells Fargo Bank NA, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Seth B. Burack by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. 0981-5938823 (Roundtree, Al) Modified on 9/24/2019 correct title of document (CDA).
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/27/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ERA)
September 20, 2019 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (ERA)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank NA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Roundtree, Al)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 19-2-10470-3; (Receipt # 0981-5933432), filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roundtree, Al)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Busey v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Busey
Represented By: Stuart Charles Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Bryan J. Case
Represented By: Al Roundtree
Represented By: Wendy E Lyon
Represented By: Seth B Burack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?