Lee et al v. Webb Road Maintenance Group et al
Plaintiff: John Lee and Stacie Lee
Defendant: Webb Road Maintenance Group and William Macaras
Case Number: 3:2019cv05889
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Stipulated Motion; William Macaras answer due 12/9/2019; Webb Road Maintenance Group answer due 12/9/2019, signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke.(ERA)
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Move, Answer or Plead, filed by Defendants William Macaras, Webb Road Maintenance Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/12/2019, (Andrew, Shelly)
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Webb Road Maintenance Group (Andrew, Shelly)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/16/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/9/2019, Joint Status Report due by 12/23/2019. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
October 28, 2019 REFERRING JSR due (motion calendar tracking event) to: Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
October 28, 2019 JSR due 12/23/2019. (JL)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan and referred to Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke for all further proceedings. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William M McCool. (TW)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/30/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shelly M. Andrew on behalf of Defendants William Macaras, Webb Road Maintenance Group. (Andrew, Shelly)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dianne K Conway on behalf of Defendants William Macaras, Webb Road Maintenance Group. (Conway, Dianne)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dianne K Conway on behalf of Defendants William Macaras, Webb Road Maintenance Group. (Conway, Dianne)
October 22, 2019 NOTE: Document #5 was filed incorrectly. Appearance of attorney Shelly M. Andrew is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (TW)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Conrad Reynoldson on behalf of Plaintiffs John Lee, Stacie Lee. (Reynoldson, Conrad)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) William Macaras, Webb Road Maintenance Group. (ERA)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ERA)
September 23, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (ERA)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5934808) Attorney Michael M Terasaki added to party John Lee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael M Terasaki added to party Stacie Lee(pty:pla), filed by Stacie Lee, John Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Terasaki, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. Webb Road Maintenance Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webb Road Maintenance Group
Represented By: Dianne K Conway
Represented By: Shelly M. Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Macaras
Represented By: Dianne K Conway
Represented By: Shelly M. Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lee
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Michael M Terasaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacie Lee
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Michael M Terasaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?