Maki v. Bremerton School District et al
Plaintiff: Wendy A Maki
Defendant: Linda Sullivan-Dudzic, Bremerton School District and Susan K Stone
Case Number: 3:2019cv05901
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Bremerton School District, Susan K Stone, Linda Sullivan-Dudzic.(Safarli, John)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John A Safarli on behalf of Defendants Bremerton School District, Susan K Stone, Linda Sullivan-Dudzic. (Safarli, John)
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Francis S Floyd on behalf of Defendants Bremerton School District, Susan K Stone, Linda Sullivan-Dudzic. (Floyd, Francis)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Bremerton School District on 10/25/2019, filed by Plaintiff Wendy A Maki. (Boe, Deborah)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Susan Stone on 10/25/2019, filed by Plaintiff Wendy A Maki. (Boe, Deborah)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Linda Sullivan-Dudzic on 10/25/2019, filed by Plaintiff Wendy A Maki. (Boe, Deborah)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant Linda Sullivan-Dudzic. (SP)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Wendy A Maki (Gallagher, Daniel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Susan K Stone. (GMR)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Wendy A Maki (Gallagher, Daniel)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Deborah Ann Boe. Filed by Plaintiff Wendy A Maki. (Boe, Deborah)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Bremerton School District on 10/9/2019, filed by Plaintiff Wendy A Maki. (Boe, Deborah)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Wendy A Maki.(Gallagher, Daniel)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Bremerton School District. (ERA)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS TO BREMERTON SCHOOL DISTRICT by Plaintiff Wendy A Maki (Gallagher, Daniel)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/11/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/18/2019, Joint Status Report due by 12/26/2019. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
September 26, 2019 JSR due 12/26/2019. (JL)
September 26, 2019 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (GMR)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5940001), filed by Wendy A Maki. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gallagher, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maki v. Bremerton School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Sullivan-Dudzic
Represented By: Francis S Floyd
Represented By: John A Safarli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bremerton School District
Represented By: Francis S Floyd
Represented By: John A Safarli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan K Stone
Represented By: Francis S Floyd
Represented By: John A Safarli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy A Maki
Represented By: Daniel Charles Gallagher
Represented By: Deborah Ann Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?