Bio Management Northwest Inc et al v. Leil
Plaintiff: John Stavros, Gordon Wilson and Bio Management Northwest Inc
Defendant: Cheri Leil
Case Number: 3:2019cv05926
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Filed by Defendant Cheri Leil. Noting Date 12/27/2019, (Dart, Samuel)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Filed by Defendant Cheri Leil. Noting Date 12/6/2019, (Dart, Samuel)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 PRAECIPE to attach document (Declaration) Signature page re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Cheri Leil (Dart, Samuel)
October 24, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE: The Declaration of Cheri Leil attached to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM lacks a valid signature. Pursuant to Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, actual signatures are required for all individuals who are not the filing attorney. To correct the omission, please promptly file only the correctly formatted signature page as an attachment, using the event "Praecipe to Attach Document" under "Other Filings/Other Documents" and link it to the underlying Motion. Please do not re-file the entire document. If you require assistance, please feel free to call the Helpdesk at 206-370-8440. Thank you. (ERA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Cheri Leil. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Leil) Noting Date 11/22/2019, (Dart, Samuel)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/31/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/7/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Samuel J Dart on behalf of Defendant Cheri Leil. (Dart, Samuel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bio Management Northwest Inc, John Stavros, Gordon Wilson (Hendrickson, Thomas)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Cheri Leil (SNP)
October 1, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Attachment 1-1, Exhibit, contains personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event Redacted Document located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (SNP)
October 1, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/8/2019. (SNP)
October 1, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:19-cv-01563 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number and Judge. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 3:19-cv-05926-BHS. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (SNP)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5946884) Attorney Thomas David Hendrickson added to party Bio-Management Northwest(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas David Hendrickson added to party John Stavros(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas David Hendrickson added to party Gordon Wilson(pty:pla), filed by Bio-Management Northwest, Gordon Wilson, John Stavros. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Exhibit, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hendrickson, Thomas) Modified on 10/1/2019 (SNP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bio Management Northwest Inc et al v. Leil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stavros
Represented By: Thomas David Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Wilson
Represented By: Thomas David Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bio Management Northwest Inc
Represented By: Thomas David Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheri Leil
Represented By: Samuel J Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?