Hale v. Country Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Country Mutual Insurance Company and Pamela K Hale
Case Number: 3:2019cv06059
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Stipulation filed by Pamela K Hale, Attorneys David M Von Beck and Katie J Comstock have been added for plaintiff; Attorney William Steven Montecucco terminated; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Leave to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel by parties (Comstock, Katie)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Case Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment 2 - Summons to Country Mutual, #3 Attachment 3 - Complaint file 11-1-2019, #4 Attachment 4 - State Court Notice of Removal)(Dinning, Jennifer)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint; by Country Mutual Insurance Company.(Dinning, Jennifer)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company (Dinning, Jennifer)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/10/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/27/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/3/2020, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 8, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Country Mutual Insurance Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/15/2019. (ERA)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ERA)
November 8, 2019 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (ERA)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiff re #1 Notice of Removal; filed by Defendant Plaintiff Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Dinning, Jennifer) Modified on 11/8/2019 (ERA).
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Plaintiff Country Mutual Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Dinning, Jennifer) Modified on 11/8/2019 (ERA).
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County Superior Court, case number 19-2-03309-06; (Receipt # 0981-6001175), filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service)(Dinning, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hale v. Country Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer P Dinning
Represented By: Misty Anne Edmundson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela K Hale
Represented By: William Steven Montecucco
Represented By: Katie J Comstock
Represented By: David M Von Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?