Velez v. Suns Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jose Velez
Defendant: Does 1-10, Kim Gilligan, Tenalica Inc and Suns Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv06070
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Timothy Coleman filed by Defendant Tenalica Inc re #10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Coleman, Timothy)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant Tenalica Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Second Motion to Extend Time to File a Response to Complaint) Noting Date 1/6/2020, (Coleman, Timothy)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR TENALICA INC. TO FILE ANSWER OR APPEAR, granting #5 Motion for Extension. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Florida address . Modified on 1/2/2020 (JL).
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Tenalica Inc (Coleman, Timothy)
December 27, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Tenalica Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/3/2020. (GMR)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Timothy J. Coleman on behalf of Defendant Tenalica Inc. (Coleman, Timothy)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Hansary Laforest filed by Defendant Tenalica Inc re #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Coleman, Timothy)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant Tenalica Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/26/2019, (Coleman, Timothy)
November 14, 2019 JSR due 2/12/2020. (JL)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/29/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/5/2020, Joint Status Report due by 2/12/2020. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Orlando FL address. (JL)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Orlando FL address. Modified on 11/14/2019 (JL).
November 14, 2019 Summons(es) Issued in Paper Form as to defendant(s) Kim Gilligan, Suns Corporation, Tenalica Inc. Three summons mailed to plaintiff. (ERA)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (ERA - cc: plaintiff)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Does 1-10, Kim Gilligan, Suns Corporation, Tenalica Inc, filed by Jose Velez. (Receipt # SEA098655) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ERA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2019: #2 Summons - Suns Corporation, #3 Summons - Tenalica Inc, #4 Summons - Kim Gilligan) (ERA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velez v. Suns Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenalica Inc
Represented By: Timothy J. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suns Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?