Gray v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dexter O Gray
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv06074
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin J. Groebner on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Groebner, Benjamin)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on USAO-WDWA via email on 11/15/2019, filed by Plaintiff Dexter O Gray. (Laffoon, Jeanette)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (TH)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Dexter O Gray. (TH)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (TH)
November 13, 2019 REFERRING #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to: Judge Brian A Tsuchida. (GMR)
November 13, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GMR)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Dexter O Gray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Laffoon, Jeanette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Benjamin J. Groebner
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter O Gray
Represented By: Jeanette Laffoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?