Stein v. Synergy Trucking LTD et al
Plaintiff: Ginger Stein and Ginger L Stein
Defendant: Gurjeet Sran, Synergy Trucking LTD, Jane Doe Sran, John & Jane Does 1-10 and Gurjeet S Sran
Case Number: 3:2019cv06090
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 CONFORMED COPY received re #9 Remand Letter to Thurston County Superior Court. (ERA)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER to Thurston County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court per #8 Order. (SP)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to Remand Case re #7 Stipulated MOTION TO REMAND filed by Jane Doe Sran, Synergy Trucking LTD, Gurjeet S. Sran. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION TO REMAND, filed by Defendants Gurjeet S Sran, Jane Doe Sran, Synergy Trucking LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/11/2019, (Woods, Dennis)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney David Scott Blair. Filed by Plaintiff Ginger L Stein. (Blair, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants Gurjeet S Sran, Jane Doe Sran, Synergy Trucking LTD (Woods, Dennis)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Synergy Trucking LTD (Woods, Dennis)
November 19, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Synergy Trucking LTD must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/26/2019. (GMR)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GMR)
November 19, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, Decl of Dennis G. Woods by Defendants Gurjeet Sran, Jane Doe Sran, Synergy Trucking LTD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court filings)(Woods, Dennis)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 19-2-05648-34; (Receipt # 0981-6012588), filed by Gurjeet Sran, Jane Doe Sran, Synergy Trucking LTD. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. Synergy Trucking LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurjeet Sran
Represented By: Dennis G Woods
Represented By: Sebastian Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy Trucking LTD
Represented By: Dennis G Woods
Represented By: Sebastian Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Sran
Represented By: Dennis G Woods
Represented By: Sebastian Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurjeet S Sran
Represented By: Dennis G Woods
Represented By: Sebastian Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger Stein
Represented By: David Scott Blair
Represented By: Leonard Semenea
Represented By: Alex Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger L Stein
Represented By: David Scott Blair
Represented By: Leonard Semenea
Represented By: Alex Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?