Khamnoy v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Paul Khamnoy
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation and Does 1-50
Case Number: 3:2019cv06223
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Attorneys Andrew Gordon Yates and Warren E. Babb, Jr added for National Railroad Passenger Corporation, per #4 Notice of Appearance. (GMR)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tim D. Wackerbarth on behalf of Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (MET)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 3/23/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/9/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/16/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 20, 2019 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) National Railroad Passenger Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6058224), filed by Aaron Paul Khamnoy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Grube, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khamnoy v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Paul Khamnoy
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Grube
Represented By: Karen K. Orehoski
Represented By: Jongwon Yi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?