Tomelleri v. Snyder Media Corp et al
Plaintiff: Joseph R Tomelleri
Defendant: Snyder Media Corp and John Snyder
Case Number: 3:2019cv06233
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 14 PRAECIPE re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff Joseph R Tomelleri (Haberthur, Phillip)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Scott Joseph Strohm for Plaintiff Joseph R Tomelleri, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 30, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY SCOTT J. STROHM FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Joseph R Tomelleri (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6112595 (Haberthur, Phillip)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed #8 Motion for Extension of Time, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR)
January 16, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on John Snyder on 1/4/2020, filed by Plaintiff Joseph R Tomelleri. (Haberthur, Phillip)
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Snyder Media Corp. on 1/4/2020, filed by Plaintiff Joseph R Tomelleri. (Haberthur, Phillip)
January 13, 2020 Notice of Correction of Noting Date to 1/24/2020 re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time. (GMR)
January 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time , filed by Defendant John Snyder. Noting Date 1/13/2020, (Snyder, John)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE: Defendant John Snyder has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 4/1/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/18/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/25/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 Corrected Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons)(corrected 2nd page to reflect correct case number)(CDA)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE to attach document (COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement and Violation of DMCA) to correct case number re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Joseph R Tomelleri (Haberthur, Phillip)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (CDA)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons)(CDA)
December 23, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:19-cv--2066 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number and Judge. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 3:19-cv-6233 BHS. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (CDA)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement and Violation of DMCA against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6059993), filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Haberthur, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. Snyder Media Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snyder Media Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Snyder
Represented By: John Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R Tomelleri
Represented By: Phillip J. Haberthur
Represented By: Scott Joseph Strohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?