Camarata v. McDonald's Corporation
Plaintiff: Gene Camarata
Defendant: McDonald's Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv06236
Filed: December 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #19 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael Kelber for Defendant McDonald's Corporation, and Counter Claimant McDonald's Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 18, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Michael G. Kelber in Support of McDonald's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to Thurston County Superior Court filed by Defendant McDonald's Corporation re #15 MOTION to Remand to Thurston County Superior Court (Krashan, Allison)
February 18, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE, by Defendant McDonald's Corporation, to #15 MOTION to Remand to Thurston County Superior Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Krashan, Allison)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #20 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrea S. Fuelleman for McDonald's Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrea S. Fuelleman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant McDonald's Corporation, Counter Claimant McDonald's Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6150025 (Abrams, William)
February 14, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael G. Kelber FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant McDonald's Corporation, Counter Claimant McDonald's Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6150000 (Abrams, William)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #14 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
January 27, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Defendant McDonald's Corporation. (Krashan, Allison)
January 23, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Richard L. Pope, Jr. filed by Plaintiff Gene Camarata re #15 MOTION to Remand to Thurston County Superior Court (Pope, Richard)
January 23, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to Thurston County Superior Court, filed by Plaintiff Gene Camarata. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand to Thurston County Superior Court) Noting Date 2/21/2020, (Pope, Richard)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , filed by Plaintiff Gene Camarata, Counter Defendant Gene Camarata. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/31/2020, (Pope, Richard)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant McDonald's Corporation on 12/6/2019 (Pope, Richard)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant McDonald's Corporation (Krashan, Allison)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 4/6/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/23/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/30/2020, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Michael G. Kelber in Support of Amended Notice of Removal re #8 Notice-Other by Defendant McDonald's Corporation (Krashan, Allison)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Re Amended Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant McDonald's Corporation. (Krashan, Allison)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by McDonald's Corporation (Krashan, Allison)
December 26, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, McDonald's Corporation must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/2/2020. (SP)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SP)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP)
December 26, 2019 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (SP)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William F. Abrams on behalf of Defendant McDonald's Corporation. (Abrams, William)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SP)
December 24, 2019 Filing 2 McDonald's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal)- re: #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Gene Camarata by McDonald's Corporation. (Krashan, Allison)
December 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 19-2-05956-34; (Receipt # 0981-6063325), filed by McDonald's Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Krashan, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camarata v. McDonald's Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Camarata
Represented By: Richard Lamar Pope, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's Corporation
Represented By: William F. Abrams
Represented By: Allison K. Krashan
Represented By: Andrea S. Fuelleman
Represented By: Michael Kelber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?