In re: Petition to Amend Certificate of Naturalization pursuant to 8 C.F.R. 334.16
Petitioner: Don Tri Le
Respondent: Anne Arries Corsano
In Re: Petition to Amend Certificate of Naturalization pursuant to 8 C.F.R. 334.16
Case Number: 3:2019mc05032
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1451
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #1 and #2 Petition to Amend Certificate of Naturalization; signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(SP)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SEALED ORDER Granting #1 and #2 Petition to Amend Certificate of Naturalization; signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (SP)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION re #4 Response (non motion) by Petitioner Don Tri Le (Gonzales, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE by Petitioner Don Tri Le re #3 Order, (Gonzales, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requesting Response; signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Because Petitioner has a deadline of September 2, 2019, Dkt. #2 at 11, the Court requires a response no later than August 29, 2019 at 12:00PM. Failure to respond will result in DENIAL of the petition. (SP)
August 22, 2019 Filing fee received: $47, receipt number TAC015839. (SP)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT MOTION/PETITION to Amend Certificate of Naturalization pursuant to 8 C.F.R. 334.16, filed by Petitioner Don Tri Le re #1 MOTION/PETITION to Amend Certificate of Naturalization. (SP)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/PETITION to Amend Certificate of Naturalization pursuant to 8 C.F.R. 334.16, filed by Petitioner Don Tri Le. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Email)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Petition to Amend Certificate of Naturalization pursuant to 8 C.F.R. 334.16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anne Arries Corsano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Petition to Amend Certificate of Naturalization pursuant to 8 C.F.R. 334.16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Don Tri Le
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?