Wiedenmann v. Sunbeam Products Inc
Plaintiff: Cassandra Wiedenmann
Defendant: Sunbeam Products Inc. and Sunbeam Products Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv05003
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Newell Brands Inc., Other Affiliate Jarden LLC for Sunbeam Products Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sunbeam Products Inc (Umberger, Rodney)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #12 Corrected Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas L Vitu for Sunbeam Products Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #11 Corrected Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephen Thomas Moffett for Sunbeam Products Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #10 Corrected Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brent Moffett for Sunbeam Products Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 CORRECTED APPLICATION Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tom Vitu AWAWDC-6145412 by Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc. (Umberger, Rodney) Modified on 2/13/2020 correct title of document (CDA).
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 CORRECTED APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steve Moffett AWAWDC-6145405 by Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc. (Umberger, Rodney) Modified on 2/13/2020 correct title of document (CDA).
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 CORRECTED APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brent Moffett Receipt AWAWDC-6145379 by Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc. (Umberger, Rodney) Modified on 2/13/2020 correct title of document (CDA).
February 13, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Sunbeam Products Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/20/2020. (GMR)
February 12, 2020 Attorney Rodney L Umberger, Jr added for Sunbeam Products Inc, per #6 Notice of Appearance. (GMR)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tom Vitu FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6145412 (Vollans, Ryan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steve Moffett FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6145405 (Vollans, Ryan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brent Moffett FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6145379 (Vollans, Ryan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan W Vollans on behalf of Defendant Sunbeam Products Inc. (Vollans, Ryan)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney George McLaughlin for Cassandra Wiedenmann, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY George E. McLaughlin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Cassandra Wiedenmann (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6089002 (Coluccio, Kevin)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 4/14/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/31/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/7/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Sunbeam Products Inc mailed on 1/3/2020 (Coluccio, Kevin)
January 6, 2020 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (KB)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6072036) Attorney Kevin Coluccio added to party Cassandra Wiedenmann(pty:pla), filed by Cassandra Wiedenmann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coluccio, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiedenmann v. Sunbeam Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbeam Products Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Thomas Moffett
Represented By: Thomas L Vitu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbeam Products Inc
Represented By: Stephen Thomas Moffett
Represented By: Thomas L Vitu
Represented By: Ryan W Vollans
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Represented By: Brent Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Wiedenmann
Represented By: George McLaughlin
Represented By: Kevin Coluccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?